Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/10/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/29/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/30/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/04/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/04/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/09/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/04/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/10/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/23/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/02/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/08/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/16/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/21/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/21/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/11/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/17/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/25/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/22/2004