Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/01/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/01/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/07/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/07/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/07/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/22/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/03/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/12/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/17/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/09/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/03/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/03/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/15/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/07/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/30/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/08/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/04/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/24/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/17/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/17/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/17/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/19/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/02/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/02/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/02/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/09/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/09/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/24/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/19/2004