Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/15/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/12/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/12/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/24/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/26/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/09/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/14/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/17/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/17/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/17/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/05/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/24/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/30/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/21/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/30/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/20/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/25/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/21/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/22/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/08/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/2004