Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/01/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/09/2004