Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/17/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/16/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/23/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/07/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/21/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/07/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2004