Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 07/09/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/21/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/08/2004