Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/01/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/09/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/02/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/04/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/05/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 06/19/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/24/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/24/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/24/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/24/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/26/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/26/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/25/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/29/2004