Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/08/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/08/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/08/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/08/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/08/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/15/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/20/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/20/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/22/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/22/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/02/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/10/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/16/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/18/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/25/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/26/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/15/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/23/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/23/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/04/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/03/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/03/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/10/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/29/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/29/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/29/2004