Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/26/2003