Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/12/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/17/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/17/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/17/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/03/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/03/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/17/2004