Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/23/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/10/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/20/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/21/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/21/2004