Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/13/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/13/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/10/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/16/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/16/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/18/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/25/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/04/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/02/2004