Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/03/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/17/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/01/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/08/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew