There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fallen Heroes Immigrant Spouse Fairness Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to waive the requirement of 2 years of marriage for a spouse to self-petition to be an immediate relative in the case of spouses of citizens killed in service in the Armed Forces and to prohibit any fees relating to posthumous citizenship for aliens killed while on active duty service during periods of military hostilities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/11/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/04/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4904-4905)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/06/2003Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims
04/28/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/12/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E775-776)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/11/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims04/28/2003 Referred to
05/06/2003 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1799.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1799. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/11/2003)

Fallen Heroes Immigrant Spouse Fairness Act of 2003 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to waive the two-year marriage requirement for an alien spouse to self-petition for immediate relative status in the case of a spouse of a citizen who dies while on active service in the armed forces.

Prohibits any fees relating to posthumous citizenship for aliens killed while on active duty service during periods of military hostilities.