There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

State and Local Reservist First Responders Assistance Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Homeland Security to make grants to reimburse State and local governments and Indian tribes for certain costs relating to the mobilization of Reserves who are first responder personnel of such governments or tribes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/11/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
05/05/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/14/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/11/2003Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/09/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2003

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/11/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management04/14/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/11/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/24/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary04/11/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/05/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1803. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/11/2003)

State and Local Reservist First Responders Assistance Act of 2003 - Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security to make grants to reimburse any State, local government, or Indian tribe for costs incurred as a result of a call or order to active duty of armed forces reserves who are first responder personnel, including: (1) costs of hiring first responder personnel to replace such reserves; and (2) overtime pay costs for other first responder personnel.

Permits: (1) reimbursement only if the State, local government, or tribe would not have incurred such costs but for the absence of first responder personnel; (2) costs to be reimbursed only for a reserve who serves at least six consecutive months on active duty at any time during the two years preceding the application for the grant; and (3) reimbursable costs to include any costs in connection with such reserve's active duty.