Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/30/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/30/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/30/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/06/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/06/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/02/2003