Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/06/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/09/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/17/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/23/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/09/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/23/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/20/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/20/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/28/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/28/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/18/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/18/2003