Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/18/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/18/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/18/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/18/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/23/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/23/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/23/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/23/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/23/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/23/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/23/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/23/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/24/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/24/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/24/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/25/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/25/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/28/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/28/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/28/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/06/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/06/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/06/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/06/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/26/2004
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/26/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/26/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 02/26/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/26/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/17/2004