There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fire Sprinkler Incentive Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to classify automatic fire sprinkler systems as 5-year property for purposes of depreciation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/11/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/11/2003Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (140)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/24/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/24/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/20/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/12/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/12/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/02/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/02/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/02/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/19/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/17/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/11/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1824. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/11/2003)

Fire Sprinkler Incentive Act of 2003 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to classify automatic fire sprinkler systems as five-year depreciable property.

.