Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/24/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/24/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/20/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/12/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/12/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/02/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/02/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/02/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/19/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/17/2004