Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/12/2003 Became Public Law No: 108-175. (TXT | PDF)
12/12/2003 Signed by President.
12/02/2003 Presented to President.
11/20/2003 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 8, 1 Present (Roll no. 654).
11/11/2003 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 4. Record Vote Number: 445.
10/15/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 4, 5 Present (Roll no. 543).(text: CR H9418-9420)
10/15/2003 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 108-314.
04/12/2003 Introduced in House