Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/12/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/12/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/12/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 04/12/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/15/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/15/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/12/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/12/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/12/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/26/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/25/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/25/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/25/2003