Committees: H.R.1856 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science04/29/2003 Referred to
07/22/2003 Markup by
10/24/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-326
House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards05/02/2003 Referred to
06/05/2003 Markup by
06/05/2003 Reported by
House Resources04/29/2003 Referred to
04/02/2004 Discharged from
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans05/02/2003 Referred to
02/26/2004 Hearings by
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/07/2003 Referred to
04/02/2004 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/08/2004 Referred to