Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/29/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/29/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 06/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/09/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/09/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/09/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/24/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/24/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/24/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/14/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/04/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/14/2004