Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/23/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/10/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2003