Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/06/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/23/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/23/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/08/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/02/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/02/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/08/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/08/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/21/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/18/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/07/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/09/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/30/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/07/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/07/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/08/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/16/2004