Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/30/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/01/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/14/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/22/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/10/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/10/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/10/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/2004