Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/30/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/30/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/02/2003