There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to enhance cooperation and the sharing of resources between the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Defense.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 426 - 0 (Roll no. 204).(text: CR 5/20/2003 H4272)
05/19/2003Committee on Armed Services discharged.
05/19/2003Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-115, Part I.
05/01/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/18/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Total Force.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/18/2003HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
05/22/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2003-1:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2003-1:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 426 - 0 (Roll no. 204). (text: CR 5/20/2003 H4272)
05/21/2003-1:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4398-4399)
05/20/2003-11:07amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/20/2003-11:00amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1911.
05/20/2003-11:00amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4272-4273)
05/20/2003-11:00amHouseMr. Boozman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/19/2003HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
05/19/2003HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
05/19/2003HouseHouse Committee on Armed Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 19, 2003.
05/19/2003HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-115, Part I.
05/15/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/06/2003HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
05/06/2003HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
05/05/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/01/2003HouseReferred to House Armed Services
05/01/2003HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
05/01/2003HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/01/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/01/2003 Referred to
05/15/2003 Markup by
05/19/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-115
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/05/2003 Referred to
05/06/2003 Markup by
05/06/2003 Reported by
House Armed Services05/01/2003 Referred to
05/19/2003 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Total Force07/18/2003 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1911.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1911. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/21/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Establishes an interagency committee to be known as the Department of Veterans Affairs-Department of Defense Joint Executive Committee to: (1) recommend to the Secretary of each department strategic direction for joint health-care resources coordination and sharing efforts between and within such departments; and (2) oversee implementation of those efforts.