Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/01/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/01/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/12/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/04/2003