Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/12/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/23/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/23/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/23/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/23/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/01/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/01/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/01/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/17/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/30/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/18/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/18/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/20/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/30/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/30/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/04/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/04/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/12/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/12/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/08/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/18/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/12/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/21/2004