Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/06/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/15/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/11/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 07/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/15/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/21/2004