Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/06/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/10/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/10/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/25/2003