Committees: H.R.1964 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources05/06/2003 Referred to
10/29/2003 Markup by
11/17/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-373
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands06/03/2003 Referred to
06/17/2003 Hearings by
10/29/2003 Discharged from
House Agriculture05/06/2003 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Rural Development, and Research06/03/2003 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/09/2003 Referred to
09/15/2004 Markup by
09/28/2004 Reported by S. Rept. 108-376