Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/06/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/06/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/13/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/31/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/11/2004