Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/2004