Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
04/01/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-212.
04/01/2004 Signed by President.
03/31/2004 Presented to President.
03/25/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 38. Record Vote Number: 63.
02/26/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 254 - 163 (Roll no. 31).
02/11/2004 Committee on Armed Services discharged.
02/11/2004 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-420, Part I.
05/07/2003 Introduced in House