Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/03/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/25/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/18/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 07/18/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/04/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 05/13/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/06/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/2004