Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/25/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 07/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/2004