Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 05/13/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/2004