Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/03/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/06/2004