Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (05/28/2003)

Jobs and Growth Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2003 - Title I: Acceleration of Certain Previously Enacted Tax Reductions - (Sec. 101) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to accelerate the increase to the $1,000 child tax credit to include 2003 and 2004. Maintains the levels and the sunset established under the Economic Growth and Tax Reconciliation Act of 2001 (EGTRRA) for years following.

Provides for advance payment for 2003.

(Sec. 102) Accelerates the increase in the 15 percent bracket for joint filers to twice that of single filers to make such increase applicable to 2003 and 2004. Maintains the levels and the sunset established under EGTRRA for years following.

(Sec. 103) Accelerates the increase in the standard deduction for joint filers to twice that of single filers to make such increase applicable to 2003 and 2004. Maintains the levels and the sunset established under EGTRRA for years following.

(Sec. 104) Revises the expansion of the 10 percent bracket for married taxpayers filing jointly scheduled to increase from $12,000 to $14,000 in 2008 as follows: (1) $14,000 through 2004; and (2) $12,000 for 2005 through 2007. Maintains the levels and the sunset established under EGTRRA for years following. Revises inflation adjustment provisions.

(Sec. 105) Accelerates to 2003 individual income tax rate reductions scheduled to begin in 2006. Maintains that level and the sunset established under EGTRRA for years following.

(Sec. 106) Increases the $49,000 (for 2001 through 2004) and $35,750 (for 2001 through 2004) alternative minimum tax exemption amounts to $58,000 (for 2003 and 2004) and $40,250 (for 2003 and 2004), respectively.

(Sec. 107) Establishes that the sunset provisions of EGTRRA apply to this title.

Title II: Growth Incentives for Business - (Sec. 201) Revises provisions concerning the special allowance for certain property acquired after September 10, 2001, and before September 11, 2004, with respect to certain property the original use of which commenced after May 5, 2003, to increase the 30 percent bonus to 50 percent and extend the placed in service date through January 1, 2005 (2006, in certain cases).

(Sec. 202) Increases the $25,000 expensing allowance to $100,000 for 2003 through 2005, the $200,000 phaseout limit to $400,000 for 2003 through 2005, and includes off-the-shelf computer software placed in service in 2003 through 2005 as qualifying property. Provides for inflation adjustments.

Title III: Reduction in Taxes on Dividends and Capital Gains - (Sec. 301) Reduces, for the regular and alternative minimum tax, the 10 and 20 percent adjusted net capital gain rates to 5 (zero percent in 2008) and 15 percent, respectively, for taxable years beginning on or after May 6, 2003, with transition rules for years that include May 6, 2003.

(Sec. 302) Provides, for the regular and alternative minimum tax, for the taxation of dividends received by an individual from domestic corporations at net capital gain rates. Includes as qualified dividend income dividends from qualified foreign corporations (foreign corporations incorporated in the United States or certain corporations eligible for benefits of a comprehensive tax treaty with the United States).

(Sec. 303) Sunsets provisions of this title December 31, 2008.

Title IV: Temporary State Fiscal Relief - (Sec. 401) Provides $10 billion for State and local government assistance and $10 billion for Medicaid assistance through September 30, 2004. Amends the Social Security Act to add a new title, Temporary State Fiscal Relief.

Title V: Corporate Estimated Tax Payments for 2003 - (Sec. 501) Requires payment of 25 percent of September 2003 corporate estimated taxes by October 1, 2003.