Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/06/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/06/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/06/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/06/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/06/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/06/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/06/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/20/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/06/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew