Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/24/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/25/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/01/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew