Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/28/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/04/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/11/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/11/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew