Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew