Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/02/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew