Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/09/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/09/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/09/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/09/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/14/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/20/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/03/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/23/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/23/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/23/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/24/2003