Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/14/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/22/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/05/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/17/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/17/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/18/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/18/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/18/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/18/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/26/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/26/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/08/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/23/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/23/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/08/2004