Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/15/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/02/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/02/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/02/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/02/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/02/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/02/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/09/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/15/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/27/2004